This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:29:06 (UTC).

EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE VS MENDEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MENDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven, Benavides, Jose R. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0353

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE

Defendant

MENDEZ, APOLONIO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Exemption - Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Rejection/Correction Notice: Claim of Exemption 10/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: Received from Catherine from the Visalia Civil Division, County of Tulare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Tulare County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to Apolonio Mendez (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE; Awarded Against: MENDEZ, APOLONIO; Amount; Damages: $3,120.32; Costs: $90.00; Total: $3210.32; Party: Names: EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE; MENDEZ, APOLONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE; Served: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less