This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 19:04:13 (UTC).

EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. VS AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AYODEJI A OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2518

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

Defendant

AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERNER, JOSEPH A

 

Court Documents

Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition

Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 06/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/17/2018 DEFENDANT AYODEJI OGUNDARE DBA PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER TO VACATE SISTER STATE JUDGMENT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition) 02/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to vacate sister judgment cont. from 02/05/2018.; Parties Present Plaintiff: EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

Ruling

Ruling 05/07/2018: Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 01/08/2018: Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition 01/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to vacate sister state judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition

Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 06/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition) 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to Vacate Sister State Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.; Awarded Against: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY; Amount; Damages: $299,330.10; Pre-Judgment Interest: $24,105.56; Costs: $435.00; Total: $323870.66; Party: Names: EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.; AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Order Denying Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition - Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 06/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition - Motion for Reconsideration - Post-Disposition 06/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/17/2018 DEFENDANT AYODEJI OGUNDARE DBA PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER TO VACATE SISTER STATE JUDGMENT; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WERNER, JOSEPH A; Defendant: AYODEJI A. OGUNDARE dba PACIFIC ENGINEERING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Reply - Comment: to Plaintiff Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Notice of Entry - Comment: OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: of Matthew Clark in Opposition to Judgment Debtor's Motion for Reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Opposition - Comment: to Motion for Reconsideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Order Denying Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: to vacate sister state judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AYODEJI AGUNDARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: 5 ATTEMPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: JUDGMENT, US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO AYODEJIA A OGUNDARE, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: EMBREE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Notice of Sister State Judgment Issued - Comment: as to Ayodeji A Ogundare dba Pacific Engineering Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Sister State Judgment - Comment: as to Ayodeji A. Ogundare dba Pacific Engineering Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Application for Sister State Judgment - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH A WERNER

    Read MoreRead Less