Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 02:28:41 (UTC).

ELSIE LOUISE GEE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 ELSIE LOUISE GEE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph Wm. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4047

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WADE, LINDA L

Decedent

GEE, ELSIE LOUISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, JOSHUA G

 

Court Documents

Order to Appear

Order to Appear 10/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Linda Wade for failure to follow court orders and why sanctions should not be imposed up the $1,500.00 10/17/18 CALENDAR #2

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 06/29/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

Compliance Hearing

03/16/2018 MO (2):Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 02/28/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing. 03/16/18 CALENDAR #1

Motion

02/09/2018 MO (2): Compliance Hearing & Motion to be relived as Counsel: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: to be relieved as counsel SAME NOTE- 1. Need service on all parties that have appeared per CRC 3.1362 (d). 02/09/18 CALENDAR #2

Compliance Hearing

Motion 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: either a report of status of administrator purusant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate SAME NOTE - 1. As of 12/07/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing. 01/05/18 CALENDAR #1

Compliance Hearing

(2) Motion and Compliance Hearing 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate SAME NOTE - 1. As of 11/03/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing. 11/30/17 CALENDAR #1

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion...returned via AMS

Compliance Hearing

8/10/17 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 6/28/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

6/1/17 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 5/2/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

MO Compliance Hearing - PC 12200: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE: 1. As of 4/27/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

Compliance Hearing

02/11/16 MO - COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 01/26/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: WILSON, JOSHUA G

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 100815: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 9/21/15, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been filed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketAttachment for Defaulters Returned Expired - Comment: as to Linda L. Wade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketAttachment for Defaulter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Order to Appear 10/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 10/03/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing. 10/17/18 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Order to Appear 10/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - re: Linda Wade for failure to follow court orders and why sanctions should not be imposed up the $1,500.00 10/17/18 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Compliance Hearing 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME NOTE - 1. As of 06/29/18, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order granting attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to be Relieved / Withdraw - 03/16/2018 MO (2):Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME REVISED NOTE- 1. Declaration filed 09/22/17 indicates client has been served by mail; however, proof of said service has not been filed, and proposed order was not served on the party. Need proof of mailing per CRC 3.1362(d). 03/16/18 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: LINDA L WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: RW NUMBER: 16020 DATE OF WILL: 4/26/2001 NUMBER OF PAGES: FOUR (4) PAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: CONFIDENTIAL COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT WITH FULL AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: LINDA L WADE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON, JOSHUA G