Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:01:33 (UTC).

ELIZONDO VS ELIZONDO, Jr. (C)

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 ELIZONDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ELIZONDO, Jr C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M. and Diesman, Kathleen O.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1660

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Diesman, Kathleen O.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIZONDO, ELVIA

Respondent

ELIZONDO, URBANO, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BITTLESTON, DAWN O

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AT-ISSUE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 07/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/11/19 PET COMPEL DISCLOSURE/STRIKE PLEADINGS SANCTIONS; Parties Present Petitioner: ELIZONDO, ELVIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: SET BY COURT, PET TO FILE DEFAULT PACKAGE, IF FILED FCCR TO BE VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 07/26/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/11/19 PET COMPEL DISCLOSURE/STRIKE PLEADINGS SANCTIONS; Parties Present Petitioner: ELIZONDO, ELVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 7/26/19 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Request for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AT-ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: A HELPING HAND TYPING SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: DAWN BITTLESTON New Attorney: IN PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less