Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:45:13 (UTC).

ELIZONDO VS ELIZONDO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2016 ELIZONDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ELIZONDO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0095

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIZONDO, ERASMO

Respondent

ELIZONDO, NANCY

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 02/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: ELIZONDO, ERASMO; Respondent: ELIZONDO, NANCY

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 02/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Respondent: ELIZONDO, NANCY

Mandatory Settlement Conference

**MO - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: ELIZONDO, ERASMO; Respondent: ELIZONDO, NANCY

Request for Order - Petitioner

08/05/16 MO: Request for Order:Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: ELIZONDO, ERASMO; Respondent: ELIZONDO, NANCY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Judgment/Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial; Party: Names: ELIZONDO, ERASMO; ELIZONDO, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: ELIZONDO, ERASMO; ELIZONDO, NANCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 02/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 02/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketResponse - Comment: Response to Petition of Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: ELIZONDO, ERASMO; Served: 05/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: SIMPLE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less