Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:45 (UTC).

ELIZALDE VS ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 ELIZALDE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERTS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1271

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZALDE, DEVON

Defendant

ROBERTS, AMY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FROM 09-03-15 TO 10-29-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ELIZALDE, DEVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA E BIN

    Read MoreRead Less