This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 14:41:44 (UTC).

ELISEO SERRANO VS BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 ELISEO SERRANO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0668

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SERRANO, ELISEO

NUNEZ, FERNANDO

ELISEO SERRANO

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC.

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORSE, AMY-LYN

Defendant Attorney

SHEPARDSON, SCOTT S

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 04/19/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Peremptory Challenge

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 07/09/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/9/2021 Plaintiffs, ELISEO SERRANO; FERNANDO NUNEZ Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 08/05/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/7/21 Defendants: FCA US LLC Motion for Entry of Protective Order

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Stephen Grimsrud For: Case Management Statement Reason: Review your document and resubmit. Proof of Service is the only page filed for the "Case Management Statement"

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/22/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued form 09/22/2021 to post fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Plaintiff's Jury T/E: 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 10/22/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued form 09/22/2021 to post fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 07/09/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 09/22/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/09/2021 Plaintiffs, ELISEO SERRANO; FERNANDO NUNEZ Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Stephen Grimsrud For: Case Management Statement Reason: Review your document and resubmit. Proof of Service is the only page filed for the "Case Management Statement"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 09/08/2020 Proof of Service of Summons as to San Fernando Motor Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 09/08/2020 Proof of Service of Summons as to FCA US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 08/28/2020 Amswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 08/28/20 Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 08/28/20 Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 07/20/2020 Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 07/20/201 Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 07/20/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRegister of Actions / Docket Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD DODGE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN FERNANDO MOTOR COMPANY D/B/A RYDELL CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORSE AMY-LYN