This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:42:52 (UTC).

EDWARDS VS MURRAY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 EDWARDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MURRAY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1677

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS, LATASHA

Defendant

MURRAY, KIMBERLY HOPE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: TRIAL CONTINUED TO 7/20/17 FROM 6/8/17 AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED VIA PRO PER *E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: EDWARDS, LATASHA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO LATASHA EDWARDS BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO LATASHA EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER (E)

    Read MoreRead Less