This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 04:41:39 (UTC).

EDWARDS VS H & B GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/21/2015 EDWARDS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against H B GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Clark, Thomas S. and McNamara, Brian M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1284

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

McNamara, Brian M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS, JAMIE

Defendant

H & B GROUP, INC. DBA NISSAN OF BAKERSFIELD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OTKUPMAN, ROMAN

Defendant Attorney

ZECH, JEFFREY M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

04/19/16 M.O. - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ZECH, JEFFREY M.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal Before Hearing (CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 5 TO 7 DAYS JURY FOR BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: McNamara, Brian M.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: J/T & FCMC SET 1/6/17 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 5 TO 7 DAYS JRU YFOR BOTH SIDES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 02/06/17 Hearing Time: 9:00 am Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - 04/19/16 M.O. - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ZECH, JEFFREY M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Filed by Roman Otkupman, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Roman Otkupman, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL, AS TO, H & B GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. 11/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/4/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY ROMAN OTKUPMAN, ESQ CMC 4/19/16 @ 830AM D11

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.