This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 04:59:51 (UTC).

EDMONDS VS VAN BUREN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 EDMONDS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VAN BUREN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDMONDS, WILLIAM R

Defendants

VAN BUREN, MARK

VAN BUREN, CONNITA

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial 04/20/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: EDMONDS, WILLIAM R; Defendant: VAN BUREN, CONNITA; Defendant: VAN BUREN, MARK

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: EDMONDS, WILLIAM R; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: VAN BUREN, CONNITA; VAN BUREN, MARK; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $787.50; Holdover Damages: $1,680.00; Attorney Fees: $600.00; Costs: $375.00; Total: $3,442.50; Party: Names: EDMONDS, WILLIAM R; VAN BUREN, CONNITA; VAN BUREN, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK New Attorney: PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial 04/20/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: EDMONDS, WILLIAM R; Defendant: VAN BUREN, CONNITA; Defendant: VAN BUREN, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Connita Van Buren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: EDMONDS, WILLIAM R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.