This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 10:50:03 (UTC).

EDMONDS VS BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 EDMONDS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0487

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

EDMONDS, DAVID

Defendants

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT,A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

Cross Plaintiff

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KELLY, ERIN M.

KELLY, ERIN M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

QUADREL, RYAN A

 

Court Documents

Demurrer

Demurrer 06/03/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/7/2021; 5/10/2021 Defendant, BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT Demurrer to Complaint

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/22/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: as to David Edmonds for Cross-Complaint of Bear Valley Community Services District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action; Filed By: 14574; Filed Against: 14574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action - Cross Action Cross-Complaint; File Date: 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketRenotice of Hearing - Comment: Demurrer Hearing Date: 6/3/2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Lena D. Wade in support of Demurrer to Unverified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: in support of Demurrer to Unverified Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint Hearing Date: 6/4/21 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Bear Valley Community Services District, A California Community Services District via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/23/202112:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/22/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT is a litigant