This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:19:27 (UTC).

DVP, LP VS ABRAHAM, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 DVP, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ABRAHAM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0192

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DVP, LP

Defendants

MARK ABRAHAM AKA MARK ABRAHAM WILLIAM

WILLIAMS, TATIYANA NEWSOME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/04/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Defendant: WILLIAMS, TATIYANA NEWSOME; Defendant: MARK ABRAHAM AKA MARK ABRAHAM WILLIAM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO SANDRA MCCORMACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketJudgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: ----HARD COPY MAILED TO ATT MCCORMACK ON 5-17-17---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL & WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: DVP, LP; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 8570 Nipa Avenue, California City, California 93505 - County of Kern; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: WILLIAMS, TATIYANA NEWSOME; MARK ABRAHAM AKA MARK ABRAHAM WILLIAM; Party: Names: DVP, LP; WILLIAMS, TATIYANA NEWSOME; MARK ABRAHAM AKA MARK ABRAHAM WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/04/17: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR TATIYANA NEWSOME WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DVP, LP; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less