This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 04:39:05 (UTC).

DURWIN VS S&S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 DURWIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against S S HOMES OF THE CENTRAL COAST, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1186

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HINOJOSA, MANUEL ESPINDOLA

LOPEZ, JONATHAN I M

MEJIA, JOSUE M

GASTELUM, HECTOR M

SMITH, BEATRICE

CHAVEZ, SONIA

DURWIN, ISIDRA ROBLES

MEJIA, MYRA

LOPEZ, KATHYA I

RUBIN, MARY

VALENZUELA III, ANTHONY

RINCON, BRAULIO E

LOPEZ, FRANCISCO NAJERA

SINGH, JESSICA A

OAKES, HIAWATHA

RUIZ, SALVADOR

RUBIN, EDDIE

LOPEZ, ARMANDO RIVERA

SALVADOR RUIZ TRUSTEE OF THE RUIZ FAMILY TRUST

LLAMAS, JUAN C

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

Other Attorneys

FELD, JASON DANIEL

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

CANO, GINO

MCCLAIN-SEWER, IAN

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

MURPHY, JASON M

SMILEY, DAVID W.

PATRICIA, MCDONALD A

ORLAND, JAMES J

WOOLFALL, BRIAN D

MENDES, PATRICK J

PENDLETON, MELODY RUSSELL

FIDGER, ANGELA R

FIELDS, GARY D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/14/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason Feld Re: Cross-Complaint & Summons Per conversation with Gloria the Summons does not conform to Cross-Complaint. Rosedale Ceramic Tile and Marble names, both of them, are not correct. They will correct and resubmit together with the Cross-Complaint. Also, we don't need a proof of service attached to the Summons. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Jason Feld; Re:Proof of Service; Reason:Proof of Service of Summons on Cross Complaint for this Party was already filed on 08/09/2019, if this is amended please notate that on this document and resubmit.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proposed Pre-trial order rejected. Proof of service is required. returned via USPS

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service must have a proper facepage or attach to answer to cross complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Answer & Cross-Complaint: Reject per filer Lynn Springer

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Answer to Cross-Complaint and Notice of Jury Deposit

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: to James J. Orland for answer to Cross Complaint Reason: Answer for party being named has been previously filed on 11/20/19 by attorney Tina L. Schoneman. Please contact the Clerk's office with any questions.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: A Case Management Statement was field with the Court on 10/15/19. If this is an amended statement, please state "AMENDED" on the form.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: James Orland Re: Notice of Association of Counsel Reason: Signature of original attorney and associating attorney is required.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: as to Weslar, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action - Cross Action Cross-Complaint; File Date: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: and Demand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Proof of Service by Electronic Mail as to Answer; Cross-Complaint; Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: Cross Complaint of TK Pacific, Inc.dba GH Slack & Son

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint - Comment: Answer of Cross-Defendant, TK Pacific, Inc. dba GH Slack & Son to Cross-Complaint of S&S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney - Comment: as to James Oralnd, Esq. Orland Law Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Pretrial Order No. 4 Having read and approved Pretrial Order No. 4, including the request to continue the February 11, 2020 Case Management Conference to June 11, 2020, at 8: 1 5 a.m.., each and every recommendation and provision contained herein is approved and made the Order of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint Issued - Comment: & Filed by S&S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jason Feld Re: Cross-Complaint & Summons Per conversation with Gloria the Summons does not conform to Cross-Complaint. Rosedale Ceramic Tile and Marble names, both of them, are not correct. They will correct and resubmit together with the Cross-Complaint. Also, we don't need a proof of service attached to the Summons. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: By S&S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Defendant S&S Homes of the Central Coast, Inc., a California Corporation; Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: without prejudice as to Jonathan I M Lopez and Hector M Gastelum only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/14/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via E File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smiley, David W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cano, Gino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOLFALL BRIAN DEREK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PENDLETON MELODY RUSSELL