Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 19:16:02 (UTC).

DURAN VS GREYHOUND LINES

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 DURAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GREYHOUND LINES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2407

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DURAN, SELINA MARGARITA

Defendants

FIRST GROUP AMERICA, INC.

GREYHOUND LINES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBBINS, CLAY, III

Defendant Attorney

CHERMELA, JASON R

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance - Comment: of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: by Greyhound Lines, Inc. and First Group America, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Greyhound Lines, Inc: Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to First Group America, Inc: Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/19/2020; Served: 10/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST GROUP AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Greyhound Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHERMELA JASON R