This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 11:56:13 (UTC).

DUNLAP VS STOCKDALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 DUNLAP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STOCKDALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1831

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNLAP, LISA

Defendant

STOCKDALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ABRISHAMI, EMANUEL J

JOHNSON, CRAIG E

Defendant Attorneys

ALAMI, SANAZ

FLORES, ZOJEILA I

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/07/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TEXAS CHILD SUPPORT LIEN PENDING

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Craig E Johnson Re: Request for Dismissal Reason: Court Fees and Costs need to be paid before filing dismissal.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CASE SETTLED AT MSC 6/21/19 BY DRL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: A Stipulaiton and Order will need to be filed for a request to move a hearing date.

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 06/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 07/15/2019 (17) T/E 7 days

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 09/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to set Trial and MSC dates

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: JOHNSON, CRAIG E; Defendant; Attorney: ALAMI, SANAZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/07/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice, entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/07/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TEXAS CHILD SUPPORT LIEN PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Craig E Johnson Re: Request for Dismissal Reason: Court Fees and Costs need to be paid before filing dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CASE SETTLED AT MSC 6/21/19 BY DRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: to Continue Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Good Cause appearing therefore, this Court orders as follows: 1. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal in this matter, currenlty scheduled for August 12, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Department "17" of this Court, be continued to 9/30/2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17 of this Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: A Stipulaiton and Order will need to be filed for a request to move a hearing date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settlement Reached; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Further - Mandatory Settlement Conference 06/14/2019: Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO STOCKDALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO STOCKDALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO LISA DUNLAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/22/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO LISA DUNLAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less