This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 12:26:55 (UTC).

DUNLAP VS. STANLEY

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 DUNLAP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STANLEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Brumfield, Lorna H., Chapin, Sidney P., Wyatt, Ralph Wm. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9011

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Wyatt, Ralph Wm.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNLAP, GREGORY R.

Defendants

STANLEY, HEATHER J C

STANLEY, HEATHER J.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUSSONE, JOSEPH D

Po Box 1207

Cambria, CA 934281207

Defendant Attorneys

CLIFFORD, STEPHEN T

Attorney at CLIFFORD & BROWN

1430 Truxtun Ave #900

Bakersfield, CA 933015230

WERNER, JOSEPH A

HARDING, ROBERT D

 

Court Documents

Motion for New Trial

Motion for New Trial 02/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion; Parties Present Plaintiff: DUNLAP, GREGORY R.; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Motion to Tax Costs

Motion for New Trial 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/28/2017 PLAINTIFF GREGORY R. DUNLAP MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS OF DEFENDANT, AND FOR A PREVAILING-PARTY DETERMINATION ResID: 28726

Ruling

Ruling final statement of decision10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 09/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

Court Trial DAY #2 08/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DAY #2; Parties Present Plaintiff: DUNLAP, GREGORY R.; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant: STANLEY, HEATHER J.C.; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 05/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued by court; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 05/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MOVING PARTY - DEFENDANT HEATHER STANLEY EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL MAY 11, 2017 8:30AM DEPT. 17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/30/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: billing irregularities (phase III); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Ruling

RULING: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

Court Trial DAY #4, PHASE 3 08/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DAY #4 PHASE #3; Parties Present Plaintiff: DUNLAP, GREGORY R.; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant: STANLEY, HEATHER J.C.; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Court Trial

Court Trial DAY #3, PHASE #3 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DAY #3; Parties Present Plaintiff: DUNLAP, GREGORY R.; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant: STANLEY, HEATHER J.C.; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Jury Trial

Jury Trial DAY #1 08/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PHASE III - Billing Irregularities t/e 4 - 5 days (jury requested by plaintiff); Parties Present Plaintiff: DUNLAP, GREGORY R.; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant: STANLEY, HEATHER J.C.; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 08/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: REMAINING MOTIONS IN LIMINE; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Final Case Management Conference

Final Case Management Conference 08/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: t/e 4 - 5 days (jury requested by all); Parties Present Plaintiff: DUNLAP, GREGORY R.; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D; Defendant; Attorney: HARDING, ROBERT D

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 05/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 05/26/17; TRIAL 06/05/17; D17; T/E 4-5 DAYS.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BUSSONE, JOSEPH D

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

ruling cv279011: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Change of Address: Document is uploaded Sideways

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: Notice of Change of Address of Law Firm ZIMMER & MELTON, LLP 11601 Bolthouse Drive, Suite 100 Bakersfield, CA 93311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketOrder from Fifth District Court of Appeal filed - Comment: The court has received and filed respondent's substitution of counsel on August 15, 2019. Attorneys T. Mark Smith and Dennis P. Gallagher II, of Zimmer & Melton, are recognized as attorneys of record in the above entitled matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: ERRATA LETTER RE APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF (CORRECTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refunds as follows: $570.11 and $648.51 to Susan E Gonzalez, $58.68 and $58.68 to Wood & Randall (Dawn Thompson), $331.21 to Gregory R Dunlap, and $492.81 to Clifford & Brown. Completed on 05/25/18. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2013
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF POSTING JURY FEES (AS TO HEATHER STANLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY STEPHEN CLIFFORD, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: CMC 45 DAYS OUT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 17 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "LHB" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD ON May 28, 2013 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 17 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "LHB" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE LORNA H BRUMFIELD ON May 28, 2013 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPARTMENT 17 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case - Comment: NOTICE OF TRANSFER (IN) TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE ABOVE-ENTITLED MATTER WAS TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CALIFORNIA, AND FILED IN THIS OFFICE ON 3/27/2013 AND NUMBERED S-1500-CV-279011-LHB OF THE UNLIMITED CIVIL DIVISION OF THE ABOVE-ENTITLED COURT. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF TRANSFER (IN) TO THE ABOVE NAMED PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEY(S) OF RECORD: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT THE ABOVE-ENTITLED MATTER WAS TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CALIFORNIA, AND FILED IN THIS OFFICE ON 3/27/2013 AND NUMBERED S-1500-CV-279011-LHB OF THE UNLIMITED CIVIL DIVISION OF THE ABOVE-ENTITLED COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for DUNLAP, GREGORY R. (PL-1). Received from GREGORY R DUNLAP, check no(s) 11025. Receipt #709834 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketRecords Received - Comment: TRANSFER IN FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN LUIS OBISPO PREVIOUS CASE NUMBER CV120601

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.