This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 14:31:16 (UTC).

DUMAG VS. MACANAS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2012 DUMAG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MACANAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2221

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUMAG, JOJIT

Respondent

MACANAS, JAMIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2013
  • DocketFile Type: Order After Hearing; Comment: Document Image; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MACANAS, JAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; Dept.: Delano Division A; Result: CONV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketFile Type: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf; Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketFile Type: NP1040A; Comment: Department: ADCalendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS:JOJIT DUMAG (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA.JAMIE MACANAS (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA.PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES.RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES.SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON JOJIT DUMAG (PE-1) IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 TO BE PAID BY 06/17/13 JOJIT DUMAG (PE-1) TO PAY THE SUM OF $386.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN).CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 06/01/2013.SEE DISSOMASTER ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF.THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Order (Pet); Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • DocketFile Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Comment: Document Image; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MACANAS, JAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketFile Type: Notice Re Payment of Support; Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; Dept.: Delano Division A; Result: CONV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; Dept.: Delano Division A; Result: CONV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketFile Type: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf; Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Response; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MACANAS, JAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: GRANTED BY CLERK: MARIE RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MACANAS, JAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: RESPONDENT - MACANAS, JAMIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2012
  • DocketFile Type: CONV; Comment: New case created by deputy: 694

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Filed By: PETITIONER - DUMAG, JOJIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PETITIONER - DUMAG, JOJIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFile Type: UCCJEA; Filed By: PETITIONER - DUMAG, JOJIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Filed By: PETITIONER - DUMAG, JOJIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: GRANTED BY CLERK: MARIE RODRIGUEZ; Filed By: PETITIONER - DUMAG, JOJIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PETITIONER - DUMAG, JOJIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less