This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 11:14:47 (UTC).

DUKE VS KLIS

Case Summary

On 04/30/2015 DUKE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against KLIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Friedman, Gary T., Clark, Thomas S., Gill, Susan M., Lampe, David R., Brumfield, Lorna H., Friedman - Retired, Gary T. and Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4723

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Friedman, Gary T.

Clark, Thomas S.

Gill, Susan M.

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DUKE, REBECCA D.

DUKE, REBECCA D

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KLIS, GREGORY

LEWIS, DAVID W.

SKINSATION MEDICAL AESTHETICS

A MEDICAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION

SKINSATION MEDICAL AESTHETICS, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION

GREGORY KLIS, AS ASSIGNEE OF ELIZABETH C. CALLAWAY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CALLAWAY LIVING TRUST UTD, 1989

DAVID W. LEWIS, AS ASSIGNEE OF ELIZABETH C. CALLAWAY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CALLAWAY LIVING TRUST UTD, 1989

SKINSATION MEDICAL AESTHETICS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

DAVID E. LEWIS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEE OF ELIZABETH C. CALLAWAY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CALLAWAY LIVING TRUST UTD, 1898

ZANDER, JANE

GREGORY KLIS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEE OF ELIZABETH C. CALLAWAY, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CALLAWAY LIVING TRUST UTD, 1898

SKINSATION MEDICAL AESTHETICS, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GALICI, SAMUEL F

Attorney at LAW OFC

4333 Park Terrace Dr #120

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAUN, CRAIG D

HARVEY, JAMES R

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: James Harvey Re: Judgment, per Judge Thomas S. Clark this filing is moot in light of Judge Clarks signature on previous Judgment. Returned via mail

Ruling

Ruling 08/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Tax Costs

Motion to Tax Costs 10/24/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/26/2019 Plainitff and Cross-Defendant: Rebecca D. Duke, Motion to Strike or Tax Costs, ResID: 36005, Deputy: VERONICAU. 10/1/2019 3:14:51 PM

Motion for Judgment Not Withstanding Verdict

Motion for Judgment Not Withstanding Verdict 10/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: filed on 9/6/2019 Plaintiff Rebecca Duke Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Jury Verdict ResID: 35809, Deputy: GRACIEG. 9/10/2019 4:36:28 PM

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed order rejected for failure to comply with CRC Rule 3.1312 (b) ...transmit the proposed order to the court together with a summary of any responses of the other parties or a statement that no responses were received. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Notice, Filing has a dark line accross all the pages. Please correct and resubmit.

Ruling

Ruling 08/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Jury Trial

Jury Trial DAY #18 08/01/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DAY #18

Jury Trial

Jury Trial DAY #17 07/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DAY #17

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: (Amended) Based on the foregoing verdict(s) and findings, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: 1. Plaintiff, Rebecca D. Duke, shall take nothing from Skinsation Medical Aesthetics, A Medical Group, Inc; from Gregory Klis; from David Lewis; or from Jane Zander, or any of them. 2. Defendant and Cross-Complainant, Skinsation Medical Aesthetics, A Medical Group, Inc., shall have and recover from Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant, Rebecca D. Duke, the sum of $229,123.73, plus interest at the legal rate of 10% per annum from the date of this Amended Judgment until paid. 3. Defendants and Cross-Complainants, Gregory Klis and David W. Lewis, shall have and recover from Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant, Rebecca D. Duke, the sum of $264,162.91, plus interest at the legal rate of 10% per annum from the date of this Amended Judgment until paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order re Motion for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order re Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Notice, Filing has a dark line accross all the pages. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Granting, In Part, Plaintff's Motion to Tax Costs IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following items in defendant, SKINSATION MEDICAL AESTHETICS, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'s Memorandum of Costs are taxed: Item 1 in the amount of $435.00 consisting of filing fees on behalf of Jane Zander; Item 2 in the amount of $150.00 consisting of jury fees posted on behalf of Jane Zander; Item 4 in the amount of $63.20 consisting of copies of deposition transcripts of David Lewis and Gregory Klis taken in the unrelated legal malpractice litigation; Item 10 in the following amounts: $38.00 consisting of postage; $1160.13 consisting of outside vendor copy charges; $850.75 consisting of meal expenses during trial; and, $76.79 consisting of overnight delivery fees. It is further ordered that in addition to the relief awarded in the judgment previously entered in this action on August 30, 2019, SKINSATION MEDICAL AESTHETICS, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC., shall recover from plaintiff, REBECCA D. DUKE, costs in the amount of $21,622.82.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Christopher J. Hagan Date of Letter: 11/07/2019 Re: Proposed Order was provide to plaintiff's counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketOrder Denying Motion - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: to Strike or Tax Costs Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Correspondence per CRC Rule 3.1312

    Read MoreRead Less
433 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: Filed by Christopher J. Hagan, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): on 7/23/15 Judge Brumfield granted an extension of time to respond until 8/24/15 for both defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: Extension granted. responsive pleadings to be filed by 8/24/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: Filed by Craig D. Braun.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for DUKE, REBECCA D. (PL-1). Received from ACS, check no(s) 10784. Receipt #837287 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: ON COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 30, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 30, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY SAMUEL F. GALICI, ESQ; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 1/21/2016 8:00 A.M. DEPARTMENT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALICI, SAMUEL F.