This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 09:41:16 (UTC).

DUFF VS BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC., A CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 DUFF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zulfa, David and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0859

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zulfa, David

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUFF, CHRISTINE

Defendants

TORRES, RICK

TORRES, SONYA

RST CRANES, INC., A CORPORATION

BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON, DAVID W

Defendant Attorney

WERNER, JOSEPH A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

03/23/2023: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

04/19/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Certificate of Inability to Respond

04/19/2023: Certificate of Inability to Respond

Ruling/Certificate of Inability

04/25/2023: Ruling/Certificate of Inability

Answer to Complaint

05/17/2023: Answer to Complaint

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

05/31/2023: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

05/31/2023: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/31/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

05/31/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

06/07/2023: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

06/07/2023: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

06/07/2023: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

03/23/2023: Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C)

Rejection/Correction Notice

04/19/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Case Management Conference 09/19/2023

09/19/2023: Case Management Conference 09/19/2023

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100859; Style/Defendant: DUFF VS BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC., A CORPORATION ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Court Trial; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2024
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Comment: T/E: 3 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100859; Style/Defendant: DUFF VS BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC., A CORPORATION ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2024
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: CT: 10/21/24 09:30 DIV J T/E: 3DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2024
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100859; Style/Defendant: DUFF VS BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC., A CORPORATION ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2024
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingCase Number: BCV-23-100859; Style/Defendant: DUFF VS BIG PAPA'S STEAKHOUSE, INC., A CORPORATION ET AL; Case Type: 06-CV Breach of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Case Management Conference; Judge: Zulfa, David; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division J; Case Category: Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability; Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: The Court having reviewed the foregoing, hereby GRANTS the requesting Defendants and extension of up to and including May 19, 2023, in which to respond to Complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Sonya Torres, via PM service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Re: Certificate of Inablity to Respond, As of 03/07/2022, the Court requires the payment of all "first papers" filed by a party other than a plaintiff in limited and unlimited civil cases. Examples of such "first papers" include, but are not limited to, case management conference statements, stipulations, certificates of inability to respond, requests, applications, and declarations. When filing please select filing code "Answer".

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Unserved; Served: 04/08/2023; Served: 04/08/2023; Served: 04/17/20232:27 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/6/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less