This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:43:14 (UTC).

DUENAS ET AL VS CENTEX HOMES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/27/2015 DUENAS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S., Etienne, Linda S., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0852

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ, BLANCA

ELIZALDE, MARIA SILVIA

NICHOLAS, ANN

ACEVEZ, SR, FELIZ

DUENAS, ABEL

DAVID, RICHARD

ESTRADA, ROSELIA GUZMAN

GARICA, MARK

HILL, NAOMI

MORA, JOSE RAMIREZ

RODRIGUEZ, CRISTAL

BOREN, MARIYA

BOREN, CLIFFORD

HILL, RICHARD

HUANG, JAMES

GARICA, GENA

MENG, LILI

MONTOYA, HECTOR

ELIZALDE, JESUS

Defendant

CENTEX HOMES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, LUCAS A

Defendant Attorney

SCHLICHTING, JOHN K

Other Attorneys

CABRAL, CARLOS C

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

PEZOLD, DANIEL G

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

TERCERO, NAPOLEON G, III

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

VAIRETTA, WENDI NICOLE

GUTHRIE, LORI J

PARKER, JAMES C

CRAWFORD, DAVID

LEGASPI, CATHERINE LAGMAN

GONZALEZ, SCOTT M

RAMIA, SEAN A

MURPHY, JASON M

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

KIRKPATRICK, CHERYL A

AU, PATRICK

LUHRING, SUSAN E

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: CHECK IN THE AMT OF $1000 RETURNED VIA USPS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY AND POSTING JURY FEES. JURY FEES ARE MISSING.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL & POSTING JURY FEES. JURY FEES ARE MISSING.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Napoleon G. Tercero III Document: Notice of Association of Counsel Check #183883 for $1435.00 made from DDS Legal Support Systems, Inc. not needed. Fees previously paid.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER/ CROSS-COMPLAINT/ SUMMONS & NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES. MISSING COMPLEX FEES OF $1,000.00

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT, ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTAND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES. AN ANSWER WAS PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT BY HUGO PARKER, LLP ON 10/26/17. NO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS BEEN FILED. SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY IS REQUIRED.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CROSS COMPLAINT. PROOF OF SERVICE MUST BE ATTACHED IF SUBMITTING SEPARATE IT MUST HAVE A PROPER FACE PAGE.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CROSS COMPLAINT MISSING POS.

Ruling

Minute order 11/19/2015: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (DUPLICATE) RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 04/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/20/18 Cross-Defendanta and Cross-Complainant, CASKEY CORPORATION DBA CENTURY GLASS Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint ResID: 29445

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: COMPLEX FEE NOTICE RETURNED VIA SASE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/29/17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT. FIRST APPEARANCE FEES AND COMPLEX CASE FEES ARE DUE AT THE TIME OF FILING.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: SCHLICHTING, JOHN K; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHLICHTING, JOHN K

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE. CANNOT FILE A REJECTION ISSUED BY THE COURT.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Cause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Cause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Cause of Action: Cross-Complaint; Type: Cross Action; Filed By: 12759; Filed Against: 12759

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: CRC 3.1385 Finalization of settlement (COMPLAINT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: why matter should not be dismissed pursuant to CRC 3.1385 (CROSS COMPLAINT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E: unk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: Jury Trial 09/09/19;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Settlement Ruling dated 8/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to XDeft's Prime Plumbing, Inc; Oran D. Tompkins dba TNT Drywall; Rosedale Ceramic Tile & Marble and Estate Landscaping - With Prejudice - Returned via E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
288 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Minute order 11/19/2015: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: To stay action and app proceedings pending plaintiffs' compliance with civil code section 895 ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Centex Homes, A Californian Corporation personal service 9/23/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACTIVE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/11/15 Hearing Time: 830 am Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY LUCAS A. EDWARDS, ESQ CMC 2/24/16 @ 8AM D4

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Brian C. Chien (No. 213858)

Wendi N. Vairetta (No. 250099) KENYON CONSTRUCTION, INC. LI:GAL SERVICES DIVISION 525 Green Street, Suitc A

Martincz, CA 945353

Tel: (510) 741-8182

Fax: (510) 741-7874 bchien@kenyonweb.com

wvairctta/@kenvonweb.com

Attorneys tor Third-Party Defendant KENYON PLASTERING, INC.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATLE Ol CALII'ORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF KERN

ABEL DUENAS, et al, ) Case No.: 9000022 ) Plaintiffs, ) KENYON PLLASTERING, INC.’S SPECIAL

) ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS® FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CENTEX HOMES, a Ncevada General

Partncrship, and DOES 1-500), inclusive, Action Filed: August 27, 2015

T'rial Date: TBD Defendants.

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS

N’e’

Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedurc §428.70, Third-Party Defendant KENYON PLASTERING, INC. (“Third-Party Dcfendant™) in Answer to the First Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs on file herein, asscrts the following defenses, which Third-Party Plaintiff CENTEX HOMES (“Third-Party Plaintiff”) has, but may fail and neglect to asscrt, or has failed and necglected to assert, as follows: