This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 10:14:20 (UTC).

DUBOIS VS KING

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 DUBOIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1566

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

DUBOIS, BARBARA

VICARI, ANNA

Defendants

KING, PHILLIP

WOLFE, MARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

DOUGLASS JONATHAN W

FOWLER JASON P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

01/24/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

01/12/2023: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

12/16/2022: Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Order

12/16/2022: Ex Parte Order

First Amended Complaint

12/16/2022: First Amended Complaint

Ex Parte Application / Petition

12/15/2022: Ex Parte Application / Petition

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

10/14/2022: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Ruling

08/01/2022: Ruling

Ruling

10/07/2021: Ruling

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

06/06/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

Electronic Rejection Notice

06/06/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Certificate of Progress

06/02/2022: Certificate of Progress

Certificate of Progress

04/05/2022: Certificate of Progress

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

04/05/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

02/04/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

Certificate of Progress

02/03/2022: Certificate of Progress

Certificate of Progress

11/22/2021: Certificate of Progress

Notice of Settlement - Conditional

10/06/2021: Notice of Settlement - Conditional

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Ruling; Comment: Notice of Ruling on Order to Show Cause re Dismissal; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ex Parte Order; Comment: order granting exparte application for leave to amend complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Comment: 1. STRICT LIABILITY FOR DOG BITE2. NEGLIGENCE3. NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ex Parte Application / Petition; Comment: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to Amend Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Mark G. Shihady; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: Guardian ad litem: Anna Vicari, Minor: Barbara DuBois; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: ORDER:IT IS SO ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause presently scheduled for February 7,2022, is continued to April 8, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Comment: Request for Extension of Dismissal HRG 2/7/2022; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: ORDER:IT IS SO ORDERED that the Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause presently scheduled for December 6, 2021, are continued to 02/07/2022 at 8:30 A.M. in Department 17. IT IS SO ORDERED.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 10/25/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less