*********1566
07/09/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Kern, California
DUBOIS, BARBARA
VICARI, ANNA
KING, PHILLIP
WOLFE, MARCIA
DOUGLASS JONATHAN W
FOWLER JASON P
01/24/2023: Notice of Ruling
01/12/2023: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
12/16/2022: Ex Parte Order
12/16/2022: First Amended Complaint
12/15/2022: Ex Parte Application / Petition
10/14/2022: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
08/01/2022: Ruling
10/07/2021: Ruling
06/06/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress
12/16/2022: Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
06/06/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice
06/02/2022: Certificate of Progress
04/05/2022: Certificate of Progress
02/03/2022: Certificate of Progress
11/22/2021: Certificate of Progress
10/06/2021: Notice of Settlement - Conditional
07/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)
07/12/2021: Summons Issued and Filed
HearingHearing Type: Case Status Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Notice of Ruling; Comment: Notice of Ruling on Order to Show Cause re Dismissal; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Ex Parte Order; Comment: order granting exparte application for leave to amend complaint
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Comment: 1. STRICT LIABILITY FOR DOG BITE2. NEGLIGENCE3. NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Ex Parte Application / Petition; Comment: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Leave to Amend Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Mark G. Shihady; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Ruling; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Ruling
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil); Comment: Guardian ad litem: Anna Vicari, Minor: Barbara DuBois; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: ORDER:IT IS SO ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause presently scheduled for February 7,2022, is continued to April 8, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Comment: Request for Extension of Dismissal HRG 2/7/2022; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: ORDER:IT IS SO ORDERED that the Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause presently scheduled for December 6, 2021, are continued to 02/07/2022 at 8:30 A.M. in Department 17. IT IS SO ORDERED.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 10/25/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: 17
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read LessDocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DUBOIS, BARBARA|PLAINTIFF - VICARI, ANNA
[-] Read Less