Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:35 (UTC).

DUARTE VS ESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 DUARTE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0975

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUARTE, LOUIS

CENTRAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Defendant

ESPINOZA, STEPHANIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: DUARTE, LOUIS; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1905 EDISON HWY, UNIT 7, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305; Awarded Against: ESPINOZA, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via Louis Duarte.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Stephanie Espinoza.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Date of commencement of daily damages does not conform to complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Stephanie Espinoza.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DUARTE, LOUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1905 Edison Hwy, Unit 7 Bakersfield, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less