This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 13:57:14 (UTC).

DUARTE VS DUARTE

Case Summary

On 11/15/2016 DUARTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUARTE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0392

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUARTE, ELIZABETH

Respondent

DUARTE, OMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZUNIGA, JESUS L

Respondent Attorney

JOHNSON, TIMOTHY M

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: JOHNSON, TIMOTHY M

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: JOHNSON, TIMOTHY M

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: DUARTE, ELIZABETH; Respondent: DUARTE, OMAR

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Request for Order - Respondent 08/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 08/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketAppearance Stipulation and Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.