This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:27 (UTC).

DOYLE VS DOYLE (C)

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 DOYLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DOYLE C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R., Fielder, John L., Gill, Susan M., Bittleston, Dawn and Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1765

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

Bittleston, Dawn

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOYLE, TIMOTHY LEE

Respondent

DOYLE, JESSICA MANDY

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SENT VIA MAIL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOT IN PP BIN SENT BACK VIA MAIL DUE TO CHECK ATTACHED

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR ORDER/FL-141

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE AND FL 141

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 12/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Request for Order - Respondent 11/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCCR SET FROM 09/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 11/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 7/31/2018 RES S/S CONTD FROM 09/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketResponse to Demand for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: COURT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: CONT FROM 9/13/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketBrief - Comment: MSC BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.