Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:16:11 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC VS EVOLA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EVOLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1328

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC

Defendant

EVOLA, GARY

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

05/16/16 MO: Debtor's Examination as to Gary Evola: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO GARY EVOLA; Parties Present Plaintiff: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC

Small Claims Trial

9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC; Awarded Against: EVOLA, GARY; Amount; Damages: $822.52; Costs: $180.00; Total: $1002.52; Party: Names: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC; EVOLA, GARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Attachment for Defaulters / Bench Warrant Returned - Comment: WARRANT EXPIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Debtor's Examination - 05/16/16 MO: Debtor's Examination as to Gary Evola: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO GARY EVOLA; Parties Present Plaintiff: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO EVOLA GARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Comment: Hearing Date: 5/16/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Department/Division: 12 RETURNED VIA DON ROBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY. RETURNED VIA DON ROBERTOS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Karla Castaneda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Karla Castaneda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Gary Evola/Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DON ROBERTO JEWLERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: MARIBEL VERA FOR DON ROBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA DON ROBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less