Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:01:04 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC VS MEJIA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEJIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1313

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC

Defendant

MEJIA, EDGAR G

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Minute Order-Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC; Judgment Amount: $737.49; Awarded Against: MEJIA, EDGAR G; Comment: Plus court costs to be determined by the clerk and cancellation of the original contract.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern/Money/KJG - Returned via Don Roberto Bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Karla Castaneda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - Minute Order-Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Edgar G Mejia/Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS,INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: MARIBEL VERA FOR DON ROBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA DON ROBERTO BIN

    Read MoreRead Less