This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:49:16 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC VS CARRILLO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARRILLO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3493

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC

Defendants

CARRILLO, ARTURO FLORES

CARRILLO

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 05/04/2020: Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/31/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To Don Roberto Jewelers RE: Authorization to Appear Reason: Missing signature.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: SC-133 Mailed to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC; Awarded Against: CARRILLO, ARTURO FLORES; Amount; Damages: $1,497.30; Costs: $140.00; Total: $1637.30; Comment: The court accepts the affidavit of loss and indemnity agreement in lieu of the original contract.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 1/31/20 $1,889.79 CONTINUED FROM 04/03/2020 BY STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: As to Arturo Flores Carrillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: As to Maribel Arvizo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC; Served: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To Don Roberto Jewelers RE: Authorization to Appear Reason: Missing signature.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Returned Via Pro Per Bin "Don Roberto"

    Read MoreRead Less