This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/16/2020 at 09:58:13 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC VS AVILA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AVILA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1398

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC

Defendant

AVILA, JOEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: As to Joel Avila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC; Served: 02/22/20205:34 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.