This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 15:37:19 (UTC).

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC V. CASTELLANOS

Case Summary

On 03/20/2012 DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTELLANOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9229

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC

Defendant

CASTELLANOS, RIGOBERTO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Los Angeles County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF. Receipt #782840 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2012
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: EUNICE QUINTERO APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR DON ROBERTO JEWELERS, INC (PL-1). AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED IN OPEN COURT NO APPEARANCE BY RIGOBERTO CASTELLANOS THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: EUNICE QUINTERO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FOR RULING. JUDGMENT FOR DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC.(PL-1) AGAINST RIGOBERTO CASTELLANOS FOR PRINCIPAL $1268.40 COSTS 121.00 . THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: Claim: $1268.40 Cost: $121.00 ($30.00 FILING FEE + $91.00 SERVICE FEE) Proof of Service: Defendant served on 3/24/2012 by personal service. Authorization to Appear: Annel Martinez/Collector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: $1268.40 PLUS COSTS ($30.00 FILING FEE + $ SERVICE FEE) $1268.40 PLUS COSTS ($30.00 FILING FEE + $ SERVICE FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: CONV; Comment: Claim: $1268.40 Cost: $121.00 ($30.00 FILING FEE + $91.00 SERVICE FEE) Proof of Service: Defendant served on 3/24/2012 by personal service. Authorization to Appear: Annel Martinez/Collector

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims) - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF. Receipt #645237 for amount of $100.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 213

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DON ROBERTO JEWELERS INC is a litigant