This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 01:12:05 (UTC).

DON L PASCOE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/12/2015 DON L PASCOE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Knight, Alisa R., Wyatt, Ralph W., Kohler, Greg J., Myers, Brett and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2005

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

Kohler, Greg J.

Myers, Brett

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PASCOE, AMANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COX, LARRY R

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Compliance hearing re: status of settlement/dismissal re: petition pursuant to probate code section 850 to determine ownership of property

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Kohler, Greg J.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: Case Management Conference re petition pursuant to probate code section 850 to determine ownership of property, etc.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE 850 TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY; AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED FOR WANT OF PROPERTY SUBJECT TO ADMINISTRATION; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Petition

Petition 08/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE 850 TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY; AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED FOR WANT OF PROPERTY SUBJECT TO ADMINISTRATION; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Petition

Petition 06/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING PETITION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE 850 TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY; AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED FOR WANT OF PROPERTY SUBJECT TO ADMINISTRATION; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Petition

4/6/17 MO: Petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administrator with Will annexed for want of property subject to administration; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Compliance Hearing

MO COMPLIANCE HEARING: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING SAME NOTE - 1. As of 11/18/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Compliance Hearing

Compliance Hearing 10/06/2016: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE: 1. As of 9/7/16, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close the estate has not been submitted for filing.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Ex Parte Hearing

Petition for Letters 071615: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amende Motion...returned via AMS

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- re: Petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administrator with will annexed for want of property subject to administration 10/18/2018 CALENDAR #1; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING re: petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administration with will annexed for want of property subject to administration; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING re: petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administration with will annexed for want of property subject to administration.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - cmc re: petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administrator with will annexed for want of property subject to administration; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - compliance hearing/cmc re: petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administrator with will annexed for want of property subject to administration; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - Compliance hearing re status of settlement/dismissal re petition pursuant to Prob. Code 850 to determine ownership of property; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: COX, LARRY R

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE: PETITION PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SECTION 850 TO DETERMINE OWNERSHIP OF PROPERTY

Petition for Probate of Will

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: MATTER TO BE CONTINUED IN COURT.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Appear - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: ORDER TO APPEAR/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO ATTORNEY OF RECORD LARRY COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketReview - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: re: to discuss status of closing case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 02/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Young Wooldridge LLP New Attorney: LARRY R. COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney; returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Comment: Stipulation for Entry of Order and Order on Petition Pursuant to Probate Code Section 850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Further Case Management Conference 02/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Amended notice of motion and motion to enter judgment and award of attorney's fees based on written agreement on petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; petition for discharge of administrator with Will annexed for want of property subject to administration 02/06/2019 CALENDAR #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Further Case Management Conference 02/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Notice of motion and motion to enter judgment based on written agreement on petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administrator with Will annexed for want of property subject to administration 02/06/2019 CALENDAR #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 02/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Myers, Brett; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Further CMC re: petition pursuant to probate code 850 to determine ownership of property; and petition for discharge of administrator with will annexed for want of property subject to administration 02/06/2019 CALENDAR #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration - Comment: Supplemental declaration of Larry R. Cox in support of motion to enter judgment based on stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL: Judicial Officer(s): Knight, Alisa R., Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: MATTER TO BE CONTINUED IN COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketRequest - Comment: For Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 6/25/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Declination to act as executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Confidential driver's license

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for probate of will and for letters of administration with will annexed authorization to administer under the independent administration of estates act with full authority

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.