This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:39 (UTC).

DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC VS EASTER

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EASTER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0209

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

Defendant

EASTER, TERRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: EASTER, TERRI; Plaintiff; Attorney: YOUNG, ROBERT MORRIS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: EASTER, TERRI; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1332 W. ROSAMOND BLVD #42, ROSAMOND CA 93560 KERN; Conditional Judgment; Awarded Against: EASTER, TERRI; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,125.00; Total: $2,125.00; Comment: Conditioned upon payment of past due rent $2,125.00 by 07/10/17; Party: Names: EASTER, TERRI; DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketRuling - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST TO SET TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR TERRI EASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DOMUS MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less