This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 07:19:30 (UTC).

DOMINGUEZ SMILEY VS DOMINGUEZ (D)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 DOMINGUEZ SMILEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cannon, Gloria, Bittleston, Dawn, Louie, Chad A. and Cervantes, Gina. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1013

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cannon, Gloria

Bittleston, Dawn

Louie, Chad A.

Cervantes, Gina

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DOMIGUEZ SMILEY, KALINA JOCELYNN

DOMINGUEZ SMILEY, KALINA JOCELYNN

Respondent

DOMINGUEZ, LUIS ADRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/10/2020 RES C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 01/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V 1 MINOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: STATUS: 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/10/2020 RES C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:15 PM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES DUE: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document - Comment: FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 01/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 01/10/2020 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Comment: HRG 01/17/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: PET$435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.