This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 09:58:26 (UTC).

DOE 2 VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 DOE 2 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0143

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE 4, JANE

DOE 2, JANE

DOE 3, JANE

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOPEZ, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT BRENDAN P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 05/06/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

Complaint

01/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

01/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

01/21/2021: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

01/26/2021: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case(s)

01/28/2021: Notice of Related Case(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Case Consolidated - Child Case; Comment: All Filings to be made into Lead Action BCV-20-100459

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Related Case(s); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DOE 2, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 3, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 4, JANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DOE 2, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 3, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 4, JANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 05/06/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division:11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DOE 2, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 3, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 4, JANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DOE 2, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 3, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 4, JANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DOE 2, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 3, JANE|PLAINTIFF - DOE 4, JANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant