This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:47:35 (UTC).

DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS HASAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 DMCG, INC DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HASAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2493

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

HASAN, JUSTIN

HOPPER, AIRIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan, Justin Timothy

RYAN, JUSTIN T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: HASAN, JUSTIN; HOPPER, AIRIEL; Amount; Damages: $30,000.00; Attorney Fees: $4,000.00; Costs: $535.00; Total: $34535.00; Party: Names: DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; HASAN, JUSTIN; HOPPER, AIRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: as to JUSTIN HASAN and AIRIEL HOPPER; signed by Thomas S Clark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Ryan in Support of Default and Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Pradia in Support of Default and Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Summary of the Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Default and Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Justin Hasan. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Airiel Hopper. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: ***THOMAS S. CLARK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/03/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less