This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:29 (UTC).

DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS FIGURES, Jr. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 DMCG, INC DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIGURES, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5753

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

FIGURES, BRENDA

FIGURES, BENJAMIN

FIGURES, ROBYN

FIGURES, ROBERT LEE, Jr.

FIGURES, ROBERT LEE, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan, Justin Timothy

RYAN, JUSTIN T.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO JUSTIN T RYAN: REJECTIN JUDGMENT. PER COMMISSIONER LINDA S ETIENNE: THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE REQUIRED PER CRC 3.1806. PLEASE RETURN JUDGMENT WITH ORIGINAL CONTRACT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: FIGURES, ROBERT LEE, Jr.; FIGURES, ROBYN; FIGURES, ROBERT LEE, Sr.; FIGURES, BRENDA; FIGURES, BENJAMIN; Amount; Damages: $7,107.00; Attorney Fees: $1,316.05; Costs: $475.00; Total: $8898.05; Party: Names: DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; FIGURES, ROBERT LEE, Jr.; FIGURES, ROBYN; FIGURES, ROBERT LEE, Sr.; FIGURES, BRENDA; FIGURES, BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to ROBERT LEE FIGURES JR; ROBYN FIGURES; ROBERT LEE FIGURES SR; BRENDA FIGURES; and BENJAMIN FIGURES; signed by Linda S Etienne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Robert Lee Figures. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: PURSUANT CCP 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR ROBERT LEE FIGURES, SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to ROBERT LEE FIGURES JR; ROBYN FIGURES; ROBERT LEE FIGURES ST; BRENDA FIGURES and BENJAMIN FIGURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Robyn Figures. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Benjamin Figures. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Brenda Figures. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Robert Lee Figures Jr. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:02/06/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less