This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:32 (UTC).

DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS COLMAN, Jr. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 DMCG, INC DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COLMAN, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5754

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

JOHNSON, SABRINA

COLEMAN, MICHAEL CARL

CYNTHIA BARRON AKA CYNTHIA GARZA

COLMAN, MICHAEL CARL, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan, Justin Timothy

RYAN, JUSTIN T.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Default/ Court Judgment/ Declarations/ Order - missing required Original Contract

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: JUSTIN T. RYAN RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE NOT ATTACHED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: COLMAN, MICHAEL CARL, Jr.; CYNTHIA BARRON AKA CYNTHIA GARZA; COLEMAN, MICHAEL CARL; JOHNSON, SABRINA; Amount; Damages: $6,865.00; Attorney Fees: $1,279.75; Costs: $425.00; Total: $8569.75; Party: Names: DMCG, INC. DBA BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; COLMAN, MICHAEL CARL, Jr.; CYNTHIA BARRON AKA CYNTHIA GARZA; COLEMAN, MICHAEL CARL; JOHNSON, SABRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TP MIHAEL CARL COLEMAN JR, CYNTHIA BARRON AKA CYNTHIA GARZA; MICHAEL CARL COLEMAN AND SABRINA JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: JUSTIN T. RYAN RE: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE NOT ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: OF JUSTIN T. RYAN RE: CCP CODE 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: OF PHILLIP PRADIA RE: CCP CODE 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Michael Carl Coleman Proof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Sabrina Johnson. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Cynthia Barron aka Cynthia Garza. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Michael Coleman Jr. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/06/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less