This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 11:27:55 (UTC).

DIXON VS NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 DIXON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA CALIFORNIA MENTOR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2975

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIXON, DENISA

Defendant

NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COYLE, DANIEL J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITH prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date:02/08/2016 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.