This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:42 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC VS ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2375

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

Defendant

ALEXANDER, DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORREIA, CHARLES A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Entire action is dismissed without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Pending Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only as to DEBRA ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO DEBRA ALEXANDER , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less