This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 23:10:33 (UTC).

DISCOVERY BANK VS. VILLAGOMEZ

Case Summary

On 04/09/2015 DISCOVERY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLAGOMEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9344

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

VILLAGOMEZ, DANIELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTERSON, ERIN E

Attorney at SUTTELL HAMMER & WHITE

Po Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

MO-CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • Docket4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; VILLAGOMEZ, DANIELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Docket4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - MO-CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 08, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 08, 2016 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 06, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Nov 06, 2015 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BS OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Docket843Y Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) - Comment: Amount of $225.00 for (-0). Received from SUTTELL & HAMMER, P.S, check no(s) 162996. Receipt #833336 for amount of $225.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • DocketStatement - Comment: OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURES 395(B)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.