This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 07:25:18 (UTC).

DISCOVER VS ALEJANDRO

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 DISCOVER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEJANDRO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2570

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DISCOVER BANK

DISCOVER

Defendants

ALEJANDRO, MONIQUE N

ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANEY, RACHEL W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Monique N Alejandro via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/14/20217:55 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alejandro is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANEY, RACHEL W.