This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:31:23 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS WIKNICH

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WIKNICH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WIKNICH, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK; Defendant: WIKNICH, THOMAS

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 04/07/2017: Judicial Officer(s): Pritchard, Kenneth G., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK; Defendant: WIKNICH, THOMAS

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/28/2016: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant: WIKNICH, THOMAS

Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition)

Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition) 09/30/2016: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant: WIKNICH, THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: WIKNICH, THOMAS; Amount; Damages: $23,314.97; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $934.50; Total: $24249.47; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; WIKNICH, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: WIKNICH, THOMAS; Amount; Damages: $23,314.97; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $434.50; Total: $23749.47; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; WIKNICH, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 04/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: DISCOVER BANK; Defendant: WIKNICH, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Opposition to Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.