This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:56:17 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS VELOZ

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELOZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0963

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

VELOZ, JERARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLEA, AMANDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: VELOZ, JERARDO; Amount; Damages: $7,577.66; Costs: $294.50; Total: $7872.16; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; VELOZ, JERARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Acknowledgment of Partial Satisfaction - Comment: Acknowledgment of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Writ Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES/ MONEY/ WES, RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Memorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2015
  • Statement - Comment: of Venue Pursuant to CCP 395(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Jerardo Veloz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Personal, as to Jerardo Veloz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Jerardo Veloz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY AMANDA MILLEA

    Read MoreRead Less