Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 08:11:12 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SIDHU

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIDHU. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4482

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SIDHU, NAVNEET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORDAN, CARINA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: SIDHU, NAVNEET; Amount; Damages: $15,235.67; Costs: $439.50; Total: $15675.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Navneet Sidhu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Navneet Sidhu on complaint filed 10/14/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan, Carina M