This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:05 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS RUVALCABA

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUVALCABA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5782

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RUVALCABA, EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: RUVALCABA, EVELYN; Amount; Damages: $4,561.59; Costs: $289.50; Total: $4851.09; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; RUVALCABA, EVELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Against Evelyn Ruvalcaba / Damages $4,561.59, Costs $289.50, Total Judgment $4,851.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Notice - Comment: of Intention to incur Court Costs and Legal fees by Filing Suit Pursuant to CCP section 1033 (b)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Evelyn Ruvalcaba

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Evelyn Ruvalcaba. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less