This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 06:44:02 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS RIGOR R JALIQUE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIGOR R JALIQUE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0521

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RIGOR R JALIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Complaint

01/22/2020: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

01/23/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

01/22/2020: Statement of Classification and Location

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

01/23/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

01/23/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Declaration of Non-Service

01/31/2020: Declaration of Non-Service

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

07/29/2020: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Ruling

06/19/2020: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

07/23/2020: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: Without Prejudice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Dept.: Taft Division A (Etienne); Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration of Non-Service; Comment: as to Rigor R. Jalique, 5 attempts.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - DISCOVER BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less