This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/18/2018 at 03:10:27 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS QUINTANILLA

Case Summary

On 10/05/2015 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against QUINTANILLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R. and Staley, H.A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0086

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

QUINTANILLA, SANTOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIVINGSTON-CARR, SONDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: QUINTANILLA, SANTOS; Amount; Damages: $8,705.46; Costs: $294.50; Total: $8999.96; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; QUINTANILLA, SANTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total $8,999.96 As to Santos Quintanilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Of Non-Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: In Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Santos Quintanilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE:Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Personal Service as to Santos Quintanilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: attempted service on Santos Quintanilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Comment: Returned via ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less