This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:05:56 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MORVANT

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORVANT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0567

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MORVANT, TAMMY H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYUN, ESTHER E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6 - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES-RETURNED VIA PICK UP FOR ABC LEGAL (JOE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: MORVANT, TAMMY H; Amount; Damages: $5,197.70; Costs: $294.50; Total: $5492.20; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; MORVANT, TAMMY H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCURED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AGAINST TAMMY H MORVANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: TAMMY H MORVANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less