This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 21:26:50 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MONTELONGO

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTELONGO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Palmer, William D. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0172

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MONTELONGO, CRISTIAN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HYUN, ESTHER E.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: MONTELONGO, CRISTIAN L; Amount; Damages: $2,525.67; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $294.50; Other: $0.00; Total: $2820.17; Party: Names: DISCOVER BANK; MONTELONGO, CRISTIAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Notice - Comment: OF ATTORNEY FIRM NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: AS TO CRISTIAN L. MONTELONGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less