This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 09:32:23 (UTC).

Discover Bank VS Lubbes

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lubbes. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Lubbes, Michael W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEBOURN, THOMAS J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Lubbes, Michael W; Amount; Damages: $6,959.95; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $294.50; Total: $7254.45; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Lubbes, Michael W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Default Judgment by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.